Search and Seizure

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0131
    (SB0531)
Criminal Law - Access to Firearms - PenaltiesDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0147Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and DispositionDelegate McDermottIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0219
    (SB0259)
Criminal Procedure - No-Knock Search Warrants - Prior Notification of CountyDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0302Maryland Medical Marijuana ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0540Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Foreign EntitiesDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0713 / CH0636Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human TraffickingDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0887Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Location PrivacyDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1010Public Safety - Inappropriate Search of Minor by Public Servant - PenaltiesDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1096 / CH0401
    (SB0672)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1106Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Application and AffidavitDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1191
    (SB0623)
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1232
    (SB0946)
Issuance of Search Warrant by Electronic Means Act of 2013Delegate SwainIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1233Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Agencies - Use of DronesDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1255Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - LicensingDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0259
    (HB0219)
Criminal Procedure - No-Knock Search Warrants - Prior Notification of CountySenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0281 / CH0427
    (HB0294)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB0382Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Surrender of FirearmsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0531
    (HB0131)
Criminal Law - Access to Firearms - PenaltiesSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0623
    (HB1191)
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0672
    (HB1096 / CH0401)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0946
    (HB1232)
Issuance of Search Warrant by Electronic Means Act of 2013Senator RobeyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.