Search and Seizure

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0336 / CH0619
    (SB0161 / CH0658)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureDelegate VallarioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0372Criminal Law - Synthetic Drugs - PenaltiesCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0453Maryland Education CreditSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0491Criminal Procedure - Execution of a Search Warrant - ReimbursementDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0494 / CH0267Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelters Standards Act of 2016)Delegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0521
    (SB0589)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and LimitationsDelegate SmithIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0615Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Exclusionary RuleDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0785
    (SB0233 / CH0542)
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - TrainingDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0846Public Safety - Crime Gun Reporting and AnalysisDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0881
    (SB0740)
Business Regulation - Marketing Synthetic Drugs - PenaltiesDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0904Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologyDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0947
    (SB0930)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1212Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Use Facility ProgramDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1264
    (SB0965)
Criminal Procedure - Right of Appeal - Unlawful Possession of FirearmDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1306Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle ForfeitureDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1329Search Warrants - Mistake in Execution - RemediesDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1452
    (SB0902)
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical MarijuanaDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1580Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1634 / CH0655
    (SB1072)
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice SystemDelegate JalisiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 655Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0161 / CH0658
    (HB0336 / CH0619)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureSenator HoughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0189Juveniles - Restraint and Searches - LimitationsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0233 / CH0542
    (HB0785)
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - TrainingSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 542Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0282 / CH0185Early Childhood Development - Transfer of ProvisionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 185Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0589
    (HB0521)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and LimitationsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0740
    (HB0881)
Business Regulation - Marketing Synthetic Drugs - PenaltiesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0902
    (HB1452)
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical MarijuanaSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0965
    (HB1264)
Criminal Procedure - Right of Appeal - Unlawful Possession of Regulated Firearm, Rifle, or ShotgunSenator McFaddenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB1059Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - Positions and Grievance ProceduresSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1072
    (HB1634 / CH0655)
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice SystemSenator MuseIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.