Search and Seizure

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0056Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Utility MetersDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0102
    (SB0198)
Criminal Gang Offenses – Penalties, Procedure, and ElementsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0178 / CH0125Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 125Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0314
    (SB0431)
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologyDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3)Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0429
    (SB0265)
Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and ReleaseAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0447 / CH0771
    (SB1156)
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - EstablishmentDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 771Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0492Vehicle Laws - Civil Violations - Administrative PenaltiesDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0565Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and RemovalDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0632 / CH0262
    (SB0276 / CH0263)
Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - RepealCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0692Criminal Procedure - Right of Appeal - Unlawful Possession of FirearmDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0756Public Safety - Handguns - Trace Information DatabaseDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0757Public Safety - Handguns Used in Crime - Trace RequestDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0920
    (SB0705)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - ReportsDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1133Criminal Procedure – Law Enforcement Procedures – Consent Search of Motor VehicleDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1562Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Surrender of FirearmsDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1646 / CH0251
    (SB1036)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1726Maryland Dentistry Act - RevisionsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0087 / CH0212Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of ImpoundmentChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 212Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0122Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018Senator ZirkinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0126Criminal Procedure - Right of Appeal - Unlawful Possession of FirearmSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0198
    (HB0102)
Criminal Gang Offenses - Penalties, Procedure, and ElementsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0265
    (HB0429)
Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and ReleaseAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0276 / CH0263
    (HB0632 / CH0262)
Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - RepealSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 263Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0431
    (HB0314)
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologySenator KelleyIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0705
    (HB0920)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - ReportsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1036
    (HB1646 / CH0251)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferSenator SmithIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1156
    (HB0447 / CH0771)
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - EstablishmentSenator SmithIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:41 A.M.