Secretary of State

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0150 / CH0073Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets - Workgroup Reports - ExtensionDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 73Health and Government Operations
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0396
    (SB0204 / CH0332)
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election YearDelegate TurnerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1186Domestic Violence - Confidentiality Program - Name of VictimDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1265Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive ReliefDelegate WestIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
HJ0002
    (SJ0002)
United States Constitution - Democracy AmendmentDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesElections (G1)
SB0099Congressional Districting ProcessSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0165State Retirement and Pension System - Constitutional Officers - Forfeiture of BenefitsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0204 / CH0332
    (HB0396)
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election YearSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 332Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0814Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SJ0002
    (HJ0002)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.