Secretary of State

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0005Department of General Services - Declaration and Disposal of Excess and Surplus Property - Government House FurnishingsDelegate ShoemakerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0174Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive ReliefDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0458
    (SB0380)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1111Notary Public - Electronic and Remote Notary ServicesDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HJ0008
    (SJ0002)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0090 / CH0342Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for FraudChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0167State Government - Notaries Public - Online Application SystemSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0236State Government - Notary Public - Appointment and RemovalSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0380
    (HB0458)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0474Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0542 / CH0220State Retirement and Pension System - Forfeiture of BenefitsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 220Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB1159 / CH0026Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners - Members - Terms and AppointmentSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SJ0002
    (HJ0008)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.