Secretary of State

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0390 / CH0586
    (SB0310 / CH0587)
Improving the State Procurement Oversight StructureSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 586Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0939
    (SB0747)
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and NotarizationsDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0146Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0310 / CH0587
    (HB0390 / CH0586)
Improving the State Procurement Oversight StructurePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 587Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0747
    (HB0939)
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and NotarizationsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1023Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting ProcessSenator ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 1, 2017 9:06 A.M.