Secretary of State

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0141
    (SB0782)
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in RestroomsDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0255Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Shielding of Real Property RecordsChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0356
    (SB0307)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0633 / CH0423
    (SB0578 / CH0424)
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property RecordsDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0985
    (SB0280)
Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic NotarizationDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1494
    (SB0964)
Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot ProgramDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1703Election Law - Failure to File Campaign Finance Report or Affidavit - Injunctive ReliefDelegate WestIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
HJ0011
    (SJ0007)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentDelegate GainesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsRules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0086 / CH0668Charitable Organizations - Registration Late Fees - Distribution and UseChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 668Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0247State Government - Notaries Public - Travel FeesSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0280
    (HB0985)
Task Force to Study Notary Laws and Remote and Electronic NotarizationSenator NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0307
    (HB0356)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0578 / CH0424
    (HB0633 / CH0423)
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property RecordsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 424Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB0782
    (HB0141)
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in RestroomsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0964
    (HB1494)
Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and ReportsSenator LeeIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SJ0007
    (HJ0011)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 1, 2018 1:53 P.M.