Security Deposits

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0249 / CH0489
    (SB0345 / CH0488)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Real Property (N1)
HB0683Real Property - Residential and Mobile Home Park Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0345 / CH0488
    (HB0249 / CH0489)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0450Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.