Security Interests

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0099
    (SB0404 / CH0058)
Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing StatementDelegate AroraVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0274 / CH0592
    (SB0708)
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency JudgmentsDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 592Environmental Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0595 / CH0233Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial InstitutionsDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Real Property (N1)
HB1370Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Refusal of Filing Office to AcceptDelegate AroraIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1435Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of RecordsDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1527Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure TimelineDelegate BraveboyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Real Property (N1)
SB0377Procurement - Security Requirements - Extension of Sunset ProvisionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0404 / CH0058
    (HB0099)
Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing StatementSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Finance
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0708
    (HB0274 / CH0592)
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency JudgmentsSenator RaskinVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.