Securities

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0585 / CH0505
    (SB0599 / CH0504)
Procurement - Subcontractor Equal Access to Bonding Act of 2013Delegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 505Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0882
    (SB0578)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0999Worcester County - Alcoholic BeveragesWorcester County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1089
    (SB0919)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Required SecurityDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1140 / CH0528
    (SB0697 / CH0527)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1166
    (SB0777 / CH0321)
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and ReinsuranceDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1278Corporations and Associations - "Crowdfunding" Laws - Restrictions and ComplianceDelegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0578
    (HB0882)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0599 / CH0504
    (HB0585 / CH0505)
Procurement - Subcontractor Equal Access to Bonding Act of 2013Senator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 504Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0697 / CH0527
    (HB1140 / CH0528)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 527Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0777 / CH0321
    (HB1166)
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and ReinsuranceSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 321Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0854 / CH0568Environment - Gas and Oil Drilling - Financial AssuranceSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 568Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1051Maryland Private Sector Employees Pension Plan Task ForceSenator RosapepeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1072 / CH0345Linked Deposit Programs for Small Businesses and Minority Business EnterprisesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2013 - 10:30 a.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.