Securities

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0112 / CH0252Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions ReceivedDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 252Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0326 / CH0482Housing and Community Development - Business Lending and Neighborhood RevitalizationChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 482Environment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0336 / CH0619
    (SB0161 / CH0658)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureDelegate VallarioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0354 / CH0171
    (SB0148 / CH0170)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From LiabilityDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 171Economic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0471
    (SB0622)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0684 / CH0029
    (SB0558)
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - CodifiedDelegate HammenEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0796
    (SB0801)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0992Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - RepealDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1172
    (SB0751)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Third Reading Passed (98-41)Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1213Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - EstablishmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1513
    (SB1056)
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by MergerDelegate KramerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HJ0002
    (SJ0006)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0148 / CH0170
    (HB0354 / CH0171)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From LiabilitySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 170Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0161 / CH0658
    (HB0336 / CH0619)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureSenator HoughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0307 / CH0182Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 182Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0500Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge AuthoritySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0501Shareholders United ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0558
    (HB0684 / CH0029)
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - CodifiedSenator FergusonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0622
    (HB0471)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0801
    (HB0796)
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0982 / CH0459State Retirement and Pension System - Private Equity and Venture Capital InvestmentsSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 459Budget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB1056
    (HB1513)
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by MergerSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SJ0006
    (HJ0002)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.