Securities

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0859Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and ExemptionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1149 / CH0837
    (SB0951 / CH0838)
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable AdultsDelegate KramerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1439
    (SB0473 / CH0080)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1638Employee Ownership TrustsDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0255 / CH0267
    (HB0202 / CH0268)
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement ExemptionSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Budget and Taxation
2/2/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0473 / CH0080
    (HB1439)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0794 / CH0508
    (HB0236 / CH0507)
Legal Advice to Corporations - ClarificationSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 508Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0929 / CH0093
    (HB0959 / CH0094)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door SalesSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0951 / CH0838
    (HB1149 / CH0837)
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable AdultsSenator SmithEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:58 A.M.