Sediment Control

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1110
    (SB0645)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of FundsDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1240
    (SB0812)
Sediment Control - Violations - EnforcementDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1346
    (SB0045)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0045
    (HB1346)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0061 / CH0043Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and ClarificationsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0645
    (HB1110)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of FundsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0719Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - MunicipalitiesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0812
    (HB1240)
Sediment Control - Violations - EnforcementSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.