Sewage

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0011 / CH0080Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized UsesChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0012 / CH0379Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses - Local EntitiesChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0937 / CH0432Wastewater Treatment Facilities - Distribution of Financial AssistanceDelegate ElliottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 432Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0945Sewage Sludge - Permit Applications and Public Hearings - Notification RequirementsCecil County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0973 / CH0628Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commission Infractions - Watershed Regulations PG/MC 102-14Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 628Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0974Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Upgrade of Facilities PG/MC 108-14Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0975Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Affordability Program PG/MC 103-14Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1043 / CH0441Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1075 / CH0639Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Definitions PG/MC 106-14Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1210
    (SB0706)
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact AssessmentsDelegate SwainIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1530 / CH0254St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission - Unpaid ChargesSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1531 / CH0255St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission - Water and Sewer Service Charges - Volunteer Fire Departments and Rescue Squads - ExemptionSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 255Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0001Bay Restoration Fee - Exemption - On-Site Sewage Disposal System Using Best Available TechnologySenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0609Environment - Bay Restoration Fee - Mobile Home ParkSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0706
    (HB1210)
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact AssessmentsSenator BensonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1071Montgomery County and Prince George's County Fair Share Act of 2014Senator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs Bi-County Agencies (L5)
SB1084Baltimore County - Stormwater Remediation Fee - Application and LimitationBaltimore County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.Rules Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.