Sewage

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0049 / CH0057
    (SB0062)
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - FeesChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 57Judiciary
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0156
    (SB0133 / CH0153)
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of FundsAllegany County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0216 / CH0409
    (SB0200)
Environment - Personal Care Products Containing Synthetic Plastic Microbeads - Prohibition on Manufacturing or SaleDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0341
    (SB0401 / CH0029)
Underground Utility Damage Prevention - Connecting Buildings to Water Supply Systems and Sewerage Systems - Detectable WiresDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0366Tax Sales - Delinquent Water Bills - ProhibitionDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0555 / CH0432Anne Arundel County - Semipermanent Food Service Facilities - Wastewater DisposalAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 432Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0685
    (SB0435)
Homeowner's Insurance - Coverage for Loss Caused by Water DamageDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0711Charles County - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" AuthorityCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0886
    (SB0533)
Bay Tax Equity ActDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0910Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 116-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEnvironment and Transportation
3/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0920State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water and Sewer Lines - Payment of CostsDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1035 / CH0114
    (SB0439)
Baltimore City - Tax SalesDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1043Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Nitrogen Removal Technology - ExemptionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationEnvironment (M3)
HB1082
    (SB0745)
Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Use for Unpaid Water and Sewer BillsDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB1234 / CH0474Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Assistance Program MC/PG 107-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Environment and Transportation
3/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
SB0062
    (HB0049 / CH0057)
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - FeesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0133 / CH0153
    (HB0156)
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of FundsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0401 / CH0029
    (HB0341)
Underground Utility Damage Prevention - Connecting Buildings to Water Supply Systems and Sewerage Systems - Detectable WiresSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 29Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEnvironment (M3)
SB0435
    (HB0685)
Homeowner's Insurance - Coverage for Loss Caused by Water DamageSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0439
    (HB1035 / CH0114)
Baltimore City - Tax SalesSenator McFaddenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0533
    (HB0886)
Bay Tax Equity ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0745
    (HB1082)
Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Use for Unpaid Water and Sewer BillsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0857Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick Septic SystemSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0863 / CH0124Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - RevisionsSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.