Sewage

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0275 / CH0108St. Mary's County - Metropolitan CommissionSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0361
    (SB0314)
Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018)SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0458Environment – Sale or Transfer of Home With On–Site Sewage Disposal System – Nitrogen Removal Technology RequirementDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0528 / CH0190
    (SB0337 / CH0191)
Public Utilities – Water or Sewage Disposal Systems – RatesDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 190Economic Matters
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0576Bay Restoration Fund – On–Site Sewage Disposal System Grants and Loans – Proof of IncomeDelegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0609 / CH0089
    (SB0360)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0719On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - RequirementDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0923 / CH0182
    (SB0709 / CH0183)
Environment – Water and Sewer ServiceDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 182Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB1073
    (SB0468 / CH0514)
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer BillsDelegate HolmesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1155Environment - Soil Percolation Tests - ValidityDelegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1345Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV AreasDelegate RoseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1360Environment - Sewage Sludge - Land ApplicationDelegate RoseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1470Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Water and Sewer BillingDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1560Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and ReportDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1566 / CH0219
    (SB0854 / CH0220)
Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - AcquisitionDelegate Miller, W.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219Economic Matters
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1765 / CH0585On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Watershed Implementation Plan and Bay Restoration Fund Disbursements and Financial AssistanceDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 585Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0314
    (HB0361)
Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018)PresidentIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0337 / CH0191
    (HB0528 / CH0190)
Public Utilities - Water or Sewage Disposal Systems - RatesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 191Finance
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0360
    (HB0609 / CH0089)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0468 / CH0514
    (HB1073)
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer BillsSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 514Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0709 / CH0183
    (HB0923 / CH0182)
Environment - Water and Sewer ServiceSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 183Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationEnvironment (M3)
SB0755 / CH0340Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities AssessmentsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0854 / CH0220
    (HB1566 / CH0219)
Public Utilities – Water and Sewage Disposal Companies – AcquisitionSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 220Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0952 / CH0059Tax Sales – Homeowner ProtectionsSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 59Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB1098 / CH0714Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water LiensSenator RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 714Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:57 P.M.