Sexual Orientation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0786
    (SB0539)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsDelegate Lewis, J.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0902
    (SB1028)
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)Delegate CullisonIn the House - Favorable Report AdoptedHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0060Family Law - Same-Sex Couples - Marital Presumption and Expedited Second Parent AdoptionSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0525Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory HarassmentSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0539
    (HB0786)
Correctional Services – Restrictive Housing – LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1028
    (HB0902)
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)

April 10, 2018 12:10 A.M.