Sheriffs

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027 / CH0212
    (SB0656)
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women ActDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB0182
    (SB0557 / CH0064)
Carroll County - Sheriff - SalaryCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0235Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional OfficersDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0485
    (SB0617 / CH0184)
Frederick County - Sheriff - SalaryFrederick County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0617State Government - Refund of Fees - PolicyDelegate McConkeyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0733Drunk Driving - State Officials - Mandatory Minimum SentenceDelegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1051Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy SheriffBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1077Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Service of ProcessDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1171State Retirement and Pension System - Correctional, Police, and Law Enforcement Officers - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal ConvictionDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1381 / CH0108Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary IncreasesAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1390 / CH0454St. Mary's County - Public Officials - SalariesSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 454Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1399 / CH0250
    (SB1046)
Washington County - Sheriff and County Commissioners - SalariesWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1436Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan ParticipationCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1493 / CH0253
    (SB1074)
Allegany County - Deputy Sheriffs - Meals on DutyAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0195Harford County - Charitable GamingSenator GlassmanIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0319Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - ProceduresSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0350 / CH0490Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014Senator BrochinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 490Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0557 / CH0064
    (HB0182)
Carroll County - Sheriff - SalaryCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 64Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0612 / CH0310Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan ParticipationCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0617 / CH0184
    (HB0485)
Frederick County - Sheriff - SalarySenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 184Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0656
    (HB0027 / CH0212)
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women ActSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Public Safety (E4)
SB0912Maryland Animal Abuse RegistrySenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0936 / CH0206Cecil County - Sheriff and Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0997Baltimore City Sheriff's Office - Deputy Sheriff Majors - Number of AppointmentsSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB1046
    (HB1399 / CH0250)
Washington County - Sheriff and County Commissioners - SalariesSenator ShankIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1074
    (HB1493 / CH0253)
Allegany County - Deputy Sheriffs - Meals on DutySenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.