Sheriffs

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0166 / CH0170
    (SB0207 / CH0169)
Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's AttorneyDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 170Judiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0346 / CH0118Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers MC 1-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0574
    (SB0457 / CH0436)
Carroll County - Sheriff's SalaryCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0661Public Health - Suspected Overdoses - Reporting RequirementDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0670Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective BargainingDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0671
    (SB0544)
Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - PositionsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0682
    (SB0298 / CH0428)
St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - SalariesSt. Mary's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0729 / CH0091
    (SB0819 / CH0090)
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and DutiesDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 91Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0858
    (SB0639 / CH0471)
Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and DutiesAllegany County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0881Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First RespondersDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0979 / CH0686Property Tax Credit - Public Safety OfficersDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 686Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1359Prohibition on Use of Wireless Communication and Text-Messaging Devices While Driving - Enforcement - StudyDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1431Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective BargainingHarford County DelegationIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-0)Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1487Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - ProceduresDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1500 / CH0736Sheriff of Harford County - SalaryHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 736Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1573 / CH0819Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 411-17Prince George's County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1575Prince George's County - Duties of Sheriff - Responding to Domestic Violence Calls PG xx-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0084Maryland Animal Abuse RegistrySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0207 / CH0169
    (HB0166 / CH0170)
Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's AttorneySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 169Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0298 / CH0428
    (HB0682)
St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - SalariesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0457 / CH0436
    (HB0574)
Carroll County - Sheriff's SalaryCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 436Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0544
    (HB0671)
Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - PositionsBaltimore City SenatorsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0639 / CH0471
    (HB0858)
Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and DutiesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 471Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0819 / CH0090
    (HB0729 / CH0091)
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and DutiesSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 90Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0958Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1014Real Property - Expedited Wrongful Detainer Proceedings - Property for Sale or LeaseSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.