Signatures

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0221Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited ActionsDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0224 / CH0158
    (SB0279 / CH0157)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0331 / CH0612
    (SB0826)
Open Meetings Act - Violations and PenaltiesDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0437
    (SB0753)
Maryland Trust ActDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0493
    (SB0673)
Referendum Integrity ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0634Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0723 / CH0274
    (SB0460 / CH0273)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeDelegate TarrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0795 / CH0539
    (SB0757 / CH0538)
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - ComplaintsDelegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 539Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1318Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings TrustDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1365
    (SB0823)
Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to ConsumersDelegate HowardIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1427State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1457Public Safety - Regulated Firearm Application - Required Information and WarningsDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0460 / CH0273
    (HB0723 / CH0274)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0673
    (HB0493)
Referendum Integrity ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0706Referendum PetitionsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0753
    (HB0437)
Maryland Trust ActSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0757 / CH0538
    (HB0795 / CH0539)
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - ComplaintsSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 538Finance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0823
    (HB1365)
Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to ConsumersSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0826
    (HB0331 / CH0612)
Open Meetings Act - Violations and PenaltiesSenator KittlemanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0901Election Law - Elections by MailSenator DysonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.