Signatures

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0370
    (SB0354)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB0432
    (SB0366)
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for LicensingDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0446 / CH0178
    (SB0909 / CH0177)
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety OfficialsCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0897
    (SB0684)
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0994
    (SB1077)
Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under SealDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1505Constitutional Amendment - Clarification of Referendum Process - Veto OverrideDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1632 / CH0011
    (SB1174)
Public Health - Certificates of Birth - Births Outside an InstitutionDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11Health and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0193Physicians - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification and Posting RequirementsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0354
    (HB0370)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0366
    (HB0432)
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for LicensingSenator MadalenoIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0684
    (HB0897)
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0909 / CH0177
    (HB0446 / CH0178)
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety OfficialsCharles County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 177Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0994School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2017Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1077
    (HB0994)
Statute of Limitations - Residential Leases Signed Under SealSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1086Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter RequirementsSenator ConwayIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-3)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1174
    (HB1632 / CH0011)
Public Health - Certificates of Birth - Births Outside an InstitutionSenator JenningsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.