Signs and Billboards

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0144 / CH0586
    (SB0307)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 12-14Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 586Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0247Vehicle Laws - Road Rage Reduction Act of 2014Delegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0300 / CH0095Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 95Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0371Criminal Law - Dangerous Dogs - Registration and PenaltiesDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0402 / CH0399
    (SB0314 / CH0153)
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 399Health and Government Operations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0527Labor and Employment - Earned Sick LeaveDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0650Baltimore County - Use of Speed Monitoring SystemsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0763Public Health - Synthetic Infill Turf Fields - Informational SignsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0852Highways - Scenic Byways - SignsDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0913Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act)Delegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0929 / CH0491
    (SB0652)
Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014Delegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 491Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0945Sewage Sludge - Permit Applications and Public Hearings - Notification RequirementsCecil County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0968
    (SB0753)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1020Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking SpacesDelegate MurphyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1042
    (SB0648 / CH0322)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of DeathDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB1191
    (SB0778)
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling RequirementsDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1197
    (SB0409)
Health - Food Allergy AwarenessDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Public Health (J1)
HB1227Law Enforcement Procedures - Traffic Stops and Safety CheckpointsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1327
    (SB0582)
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed DistrictsDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0307
    (HB0144 / CH0586)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor LicensesMontgomery County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0314 / CH0153
    (HB0402 / CH0399)
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0350 / CH0490Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014Senator BrochinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 490Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0409
    (HB1197)
Health - Food Allergy AwarenessSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedFinance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0582
    (HB1327)
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed DistrictsSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0648 / CH0322
    (HB1042)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of DeathSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 322Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0652
    (HB0929 / CH0491)
Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local JurisdictionsSenator RobeyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0753
    (HB0968)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0778
    (HB1191)
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0941Transportation - Advertising Signs on State Highways for Agricultural Businesses AuthorizedSenator DysonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.