Signs and Billboards

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0046Motor Vehicles - Farm Equipment - Wide- or Oversize-Load SignalsDelegate FoldenIn the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0054
    (SB0024)
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersDelegate LamIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0175Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 302-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0410Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority PG/MC 108-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0598Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking SpacesDelegate LamIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0744
    (SB0850)
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - AdoptionDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0749
    (SB0551)
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - AuthorizationDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0849
    (SB1133)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Perryville Railroad Monument SignCecil County DelegationIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0892Marijuana Laws – Full Disclosure of Legal, Employment, and Health Risks – Advertisement of Marijuana and Medical CannabisDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0904Weapon-Free Higher Education ZonesDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0965Vehicle Laws - Left Lane - Use for PassingDelegate FoldenIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0977State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification ActDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1087
    (SB0758)
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - LicensureDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1229Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Signs, Billboards, and Outdoor Advertising DisplaysDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1365Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones (Truth in Speed Cameras Act of 2018)Delegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1384Motor Vehicles - School Vehicles - Flashing Advisory SignsDelegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1386Public Schools - Childhelp National Child Abuse Hotline - SignDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1406
    (SB0872)
Vehicle Laws – Special Event ZonesDelegate CarozzaIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1543Tow Trucks – Driver Safety ActDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1598Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display RequirementsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1724Gun-Free Higher Education ZonesDelegate JalisiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0014Motor Vehicle Administration - Parking Placards - Color PhotographSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0024
    (HB0054)
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersSenator KlausmeierIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationFinance
1/24/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0551
    (HB0749)
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0571Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising DisplaysSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0758
    (HB1087)
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - LicensureSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0850
    (HB0744)
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - AdoptionSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0872
    (HB1406)
Vehicle Laws - Special Event ZonesSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB1046Gas Price Clarity Act of 2018Senator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1133
    (HB0849)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Perryville Railroad Monument SignCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

February 17, 2018 12:02 A.M.