Small Business

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0050Minority Business Enterprise Certification - Cap on Personal Net WorthDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0356 / CH0105Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan ProgramChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 105Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0361 / CH0368Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care ActChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0386 / CH0109
    (SB0203)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts and Small Business RefundDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 109Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0564
    (SB0498)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business EnterpriseDelegate BranchIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
Economic Matters
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0681Invest Maryland Program - Alteration of Program RequirementsDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0803 / CH0390Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax CreditChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1158Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax RebateDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1173Small Business Energy Assistance ActDelegate KramerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1331Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1452Linked Deposit Program for Small BusinessesDelegate VaughnIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0070 / CH0175Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland ProgramChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0127
    (HB0102 / CH0425)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0203
    (HB0386 / CH0109)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts and Small Business RefundSenator KingIn the House - Rereferred to Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0275
    (HB0226 / CH0003)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0482 / CH0482Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer CostsSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 482Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2013 - 11:30 a.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0498
    (HB0564)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business EnterpriseSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB1072 / CH0345Linked Deposit Programs for Small Businesses and Minority Business EnterprisesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2013 - 10:30 a.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.