Small Business

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0014Small Business Reserve Program - Procurements by Designated Procurement UnitsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0169Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming ProvisionsDelegate HoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0451 / CH0228Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food DesertsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Environmental Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0468Maryland Economic Development Assistance Fund - Training and Technology ProjectsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0473
    (SB0787)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesDelegate SummersIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0487
    (SB0975 / CH0076)
Small Business Reserve Program - Definition of Small Business - Repeal of Sunset ProvisionDelegate ReznikVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0583 / CH0071Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small BusinessesDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 71Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0693 / CH0610
    (SB0504)
Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental BenefitsDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0738
    (SB0493)
Economic Development - Commission on Maryland's FutureDelegate BranchIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0887Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax RebateDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1018Task Force to Study the Impact of Unemployment Insurance Contribution Fluctuations on Small BusinessesDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB1169Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up BusinessDelegate TurnerIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1229Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Repeal - Transfer of Enrollees to Federal Health Insurance MarketplaceDelegate HoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1317 / CH0652Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship ProgramDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Appropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1447
    (SB0934)
State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business ParticipationDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0096 / CH0023Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care ActChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 23Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0493
    (HB0738)
Economic Development - Commission on Maryland's FutureSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0504
    (HB0693 / CH0610)
Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental BenefitsSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0661 / CH0070Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small BusinessesSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Finance
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0787
    (HB0473)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0934
    (HB1447)
State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business ParticipationSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0975 / CH0076
    (HB0487)
Small Business Reserve Program - Definition of Small Business - Repeal of Sunset ProvisionSenator MontgomeryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 76Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.