Small Business

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0069 / CH0473Personal Property Tax - Credit for New or Small BusinessDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 473Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0084
    (SB0116 / CH0049)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/2/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0282Procurement Preferences - Small Businesses and Minority Business Enterprises - Workshop RequirementDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0291Personal Property Tax - Exemption - Small BusinessDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0300
    (SB1108)
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsDelegate FennellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0320 / CH0481
    (SB0884)
Frederick County - Property Tax - Small Business Tax CreditFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 481Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0326 / CH0482Housing and Community Development - Business Lending and Neighborhood RevitalizationChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 482Environment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0471
    (SB0622)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0500
    (SB1086)
Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in MarylandDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0561Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2016Delegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0788 / CH0119Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program - Program Oversight and ContinuationChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Health and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0812
    (SB0432)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2016Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0917 / CH0599
    (SB0998 / CH0598)
St. Mary's County - Property Tax Credit - New or Expanding BusinessesSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 599Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1274
    (SB0836)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1378 / CH0324
    (SB1007 / CH0323)
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and TrustDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 324Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1419
    (SB0034)
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined ReportingDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1574
    (SB1070)
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - PreferencesDelegate HolmesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1628
    (SB1110)
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program and FundDelegate BarveIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0034
    (HB1419)
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined ReportingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0116 / CH0049
    (HB0084)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0246Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - ExtensionSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0432
    (HB0812)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2016Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0622
    (HB0471)
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit ProgramSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0836
    (HB1274)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0884
    (HB0320 / CH0481)
Frederick County - Property Tax - Small Business Tax CreditSenator HoughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0921
    (HB1106)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0998 / CH0598
    (HB0917 / CH0599)
St. Mary's County - Property Tax Credit - New or Expanding BusinessesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 598Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB1007 / CH0323
    (HB1378 / CH0324)
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and TrustSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1014Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1070
    (HB1574)
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - PreferencesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1086
    (HB0500)
Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in MarylandSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1108
    (HB0300)
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsSenator SallingIn the House - Favorable Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB1110
    (HB1628)
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program and FundSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.