Small Business

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0092
    (SB0498 / CH0453)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0123 / CH0720Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal LawChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 720Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0223Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Electricity Consumption by Small Business Located in Qualified Distressed CountyDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0268Personal Property Tax and Annual Report Filing Fee - ExemptionDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0319 / CH0562Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of Supplier Diversity and Inclusion and Minority Business Enterprise Program MC/PG 106-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0349 / CH0181
    (SB0807 / CH0180)
Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)Delegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 181Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0433
    (SB0309 / CH0438)
State Finance and Procurement - Small and Minority Business ParticipationSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0587 / CH0708
    (SB1084 / CH0709)
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and PenaltiesDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 708Health and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0615
    (SB0357)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2017Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1051
    (SB1021)
Enterprise Zone and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Programs - Small Business EntitiesDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1138
    (SB1152)
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Distribution and Recreational FacilitiesDelegate AliIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1176
    (SB1134)
Income Tax - Research and Development Credit - Start-Up BusinessesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1196Video Lottery Facilities - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Targeted AreasDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB1443
    (SB0999)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform ActDelegate GlennIn the House - House Concur - Senate AmendmentsHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1465Baltimore City - Police Community Policing Steering CommitteeDelegate HayesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1492 / CH0636Housing and Community Development - Food Deserts - Small LoansDelegate HayesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1506 / CH0633
    (SB0700 / CH0634)
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - RenamingDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 633Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1517
    (SB0465 / CH0629)
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge LoansDelegate GlennVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0228 / CH0452Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsSenator SallingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0309 / CH0438
    (HB0433)
State Finance and Procurement - Small and Minority Business ParticipationPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0357
    (HB0615)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2017Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0498 / CH0453
    (HB0092)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0508Task Force to Study the Feasibility of and Impact on Small and Minority Businesses in Maryland Conducting Business InternationallySenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0700 / CH0634
    (HB1506 / CH0633)
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - RenamingSenator RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 634Finance
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0723Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film EntitiesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0807 / CH0180
    (HB0349 / CH0181)
Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)Senator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1021
    (HB1051)
Job Reinvestment Act of 2017Senator ZuckerIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1084 / CH0709
    (HB0587 / CH0708)
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and PenaltiesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 709Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1134
    (HB1176)
Income Tax - Research and Development Credit - Start-Up BusinessesSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1197Public Health - Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Membership, Licensing, and StudiesSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:48 A.M.