Smart Growth

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0686 / CH0030
    (SB0559)
Department of Housing and Community Development - Strategic Demolition and Smart Growth Impact Fund - EstablishmentDelegate HammenEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Delegate BeidleGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0559
    (HB0686 / CH0030)
Department of Housing and Community Development - Strategic Demolition and Smart Growth Impact Fund - EstablishmentSenator FergusonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0908
    (HB1013 / CH0036)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Senator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.