Smoking

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0185
    (SB0843)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013Delegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0528
    (SB0030)
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young ChildDelegate BarnesIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0676Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0683
    (SB0700)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0684Tobacco-Free Schools ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0759Vehicle Laws - Distracted Driving - ProhibitionDelegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0948
    (SB0708)
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization ProgramDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1351Health - Smoking - Public Playgrounds and Swimming Pools - ProhibitionDelegate BromwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
HB1413 / CH0595
    (SB0969 / CH0594)
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke AlarmsDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0030
    (HB0528)
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young ChildSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0700
    (HB0683)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0708
    (HB0948)
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization ProgramSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government OperationsFinance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0843
    (HB0185)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0969 / CH0594
    (HB1413 / CH0595)
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke AlarmsSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 594Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.