Smoking

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0026Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0105Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - PenaltiesDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0108
    (SB0037)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0357Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young ChildDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0478Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - ProhibitionDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0489 / CH0425
    (SB0007)
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and EnforcementDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB0585 / CH0438Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking MC/PG 109-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0911
    (SB0531)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1015Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Health (J1)
SB0007
    (HB0489 / CH0425)
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and EnforcementSenator MiddletonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
1/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
SB0037
    (HB0108)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0517Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug ParaphernaliaSenator ZirkinVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0531
    (HB0911)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.