Social Services

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0007
    (SB0012)
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time PeriodDelegate SophocleusIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
1/28/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0019
    (SB0164)
Truant Students - System of Active Intervention - RequirementsDelegate GlennIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0066Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0074 / CH0397Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship Program - Expansion of ScopeDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Ways and Means
2/5/2015 - 2:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0171
    (SB0150 / CH0326)
Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts (Anayah's Law)Delegate AfzaliVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0199Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents - Child Placement AgencyCharles County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0347Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification EffortsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0367 / CH0416
    (SB0469)
Public Health - Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response SystemDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 416Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB0386 / CH0245Child Abuse and Neglect - Centralized Confidential DatabaseDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0437Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Maryland Teenage Pregnancy Prevention Grant ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0439
    (SB0685 / CH0046)
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster ChildrenDelegate Washington, M.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0456 / CH0091
    (SB0521)
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human TraffickingDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 91Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0460 / CH0422Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Eligibility and ExtensionDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 422Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0553
    (SB0585)
Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0643
    (SB0567 / CH0366)
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - ReportDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsChildren (O4)
HB0788
    (SB0669)
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care RecipientsDelegate JalisiIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0823
    (SB0156)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Establishment of a Sickle Cell Disease Outreach ProgramDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0900
    (SB0492)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works ProjectDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB10302-1-1 Maryland - Procurement of Services to Operate a Public Information Telephone Line or HotlineDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1049Voter Registration Act of 2015Delegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0003State Minimum Wage Rate - Exceptions - Social Service Nonprofit OrganizationsSenator GettyIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceFinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0012
    (HB0007)
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time PeriodSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
1/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0150 / CH0326
    (HB0171)
Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts (Anayah's Law)Senator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 326Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0156
    (HB0823)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Establishment of a Sickle Cell Disease Outreach ProgramSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0164
    (HB0019)
Truant Students - System of Active Intervention - RequirementsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0469
    (HB0367 / CH0416)
Public Health - Maryland Behavioral Health Crisis Response SystemSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0491
    (HB0465)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works ProjectSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2015 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0521
    (HB0456 / CH0091)
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human TraffickingSenator LeeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0567 / CH0366
    (HB0643)
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - ReportSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0585
    (HB0553)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0609
    (HB1022)
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot ProgramSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0669
    (HB0788)
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care RecipientsSenator YoungIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0685 / CH0046
    (HB0439)
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster ChildrenSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.