Social Services

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0256Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period IncreaseDelegate CarozzaIn the Senate - Hearing canceledJudiciary
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0279
    (SB0272 / CH0655)
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile CourtDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0283 / CH0341
    (SB0109)
Procurement - Prohibitions on ParticipationDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 341Health and Government Operations
2/1/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0519Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility ProgramDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0689
    (SB0813)
Department of Housing and Community Development - Rental Assistance Programs - Duration of AssistanceDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0697
    (SB0945)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Statewide Reporting - 2-1-1 MarylandDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0701Procurement - Lease of Property for Local Departments of Social Services - Requests for ProposalsDelegate KrimmIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0752 / CH0203
    (SB0671 / CH0202)
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial RecordsDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 203Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0937Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy ProgramDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0968Children - Health and Safety - Child Abuse and Neglect Hotline and SignageDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0984
    (SB0475)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and ReportingDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
Appropriations
Public Health (J1)
HB1059Task Force to Study the Effect of Section 8 Housing on Neighborhoods in Baltimore CountyDelegate McDonoughIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1188Advisory Council on Couples Qualifying for Family Investment Administration BenefitsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1197
    (SB0797)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - DefinitionsDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1198
    (SB0679)
Child Abuse and Neglect - TrainingDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1321Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1326Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1381 / CH0608
    (SB0866 / CH0609)
Adult High School Pilot ProgramDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Economic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1383 / CH0576
    (SB1042 / CH0577)
Behavioral Health Administration - Outpatient Civil Commitment Pilot ProgramDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 576Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1475 / CH0324
    (SB0595 / CH0323)
Residential Boarding Education Programs for At-Risk Youth - EligibilityDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0085 / CH0491
    (HB1207 / CH0492)
Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - SiblingsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 491Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0109
    (HB0283 / CH0341)
Procurement - Prohibitions on ParticipationSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0272 / CH0655
    (HB0279)
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile CourtSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 655Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0475
    (HB0984)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and ReportingSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0595 / CH0323
    (HB1475 / CH0324)
Residential Boarding Education Programs for At-Risk Youth - EligibilitySenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0671 / CH0202
    (HB0752 / CH0203)
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial RecordsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 202Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0679
    (HB1198)
Child Abuse and Neglect - TrainingSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0680 / CH0605Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion TimeSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 605Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0797
    (HB1197)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - DefinitionsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0813
    (HB0689)
Department of Housing and Community Development - Rental Assistance Programs - Duration of AssistanceSenator MadalenoIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0866 / CH0609
    (HB1381 / CH0608)
Adult High School Pilot ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 609Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0945
    (HB0697)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Statewide Reporting - 2-1-1 MarylandSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
Judicial Proceedings
Family Law (D4)
SB1042 / CH0577
    (HB1383 / CH0576)
Behavioral Health Administration - Outpatient Civil Commitment Pilot ProgramSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 577Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.