Social Workers

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0806 / CH0391Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - RevisionsDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 391Health and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0810Mental Health Professionals - Duty to Report Risk of Serious Harm - Firearm SafetyDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0876Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Civil Penalty, Fund, and Task ForceDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0897
    (SB0570)
Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and DisciplineDelegate HoughIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1115 / CH0404
    (SB0593)
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from LiabilityDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 404Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1245
    (SB0822)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1290
    (SB0837)
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on StaysDelegate FrankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1310
    (SB0834)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1320 / CH0413Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - ExtensionDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0094Child Abuse and Neglect - Notice and Reporting Requirements, Disclosure, and Task ForceSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0382Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Surrender of FirearmsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Health (J1)
SB0570
    (HB0897)
Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and DisciplineSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0593
    (HB1115 / CH0404)
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from LiabilitySenator MontgomeryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0822
    (HB1245)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0837
    (HB1290)
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on StaysSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.