Social Workers

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0091Health Occupations - Sexual Orientation Change Efforts - ProhibitedDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations Health Occupations (J2)
HB0151 / CH0216Juvenile Services - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Reporting RequirementDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 216Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0273
    (SB0262)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0395
    (SB0702)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Delegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0641 / CH0196
    (SB0803 / CH0195)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to PrivilegeDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0841State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists and State Board of Social Work Examiners - Grounds for Denying Licenses and CertificatesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1053
    (SB0210)
Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Penalties and Task ForceDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1069Health Occupations - Social Workers - Authorization for an Individual to Maintain an Action to EnjoinDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1222 / CH0647Ruth M. Kirk Public Social Work ScholarshipDelegate HaynesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1339
    (SB0807)
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and ReportingDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1404Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing EducationDelegate Nathan-PulliamIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Health Occupations (J2)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0210
    (HB1053)
Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Penalties and Task ForceSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0262
    (HB0273)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0607Health Occupations - Child Abuse and Neglect - TrainingSenator ShankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0702
    (HB0395)
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"Senator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0803 / CH0195
    (HB0641 / CH0196)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to PrivilegeSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0807
    (HB1339)
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and ReportingSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 20, 2014 12:22 P.M.