Social Workers

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0326
    (SB0288)
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility ProgramDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0490
    (SB0163)
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and CertificationDelegate LamIn the House - Returned PassedHealth and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0742
    (SB0552)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Returned PassedHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0827
    (SB0669)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion ProgramDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1289Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder ScreeningsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1299Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature RequirementDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1628Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
SB0288
    (HB0326)
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Supervised Drug Consumption Facility ProgramSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0552
    (HB0742)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0669
    (HB0827)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion ProgramSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB1263Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.