Solicitation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0141Ethics Law - Soliciting the Employment of LobbyistDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB0228 / CH0159
    (SB0274)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0467 / CH0118Allegany County - Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Permit DurationAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0493
    (SB0673)
Referendum Integrity ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0605Public-Private PartnershipsDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
Appropriations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0699
    (SB0416)
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0854 / CH0643
    (SB0479)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally ResponsibleDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 643Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1113Procurement - Disclosure Requirements and PenaltiesDelegate BohananIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0055 / CH0009Private Career Schools - Solicitor Permits - RepealChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 9Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0274
    (HB0228 / CH0159)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0416
    (HB0699)
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0479
    (HB0854 / CH0643)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally ResponsibleSenator GladdenIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0538
    (HB0560 / CH0005)
Public-Private PartnershipsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0673
    (HB0493)
Referendum Integrity ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.