Solicitation

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0283 / CH0341
    (SB0109)
Procurement - Prohibitions on ParticipationDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 341Health and Government Operations
2/1/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0299Campaign Finance - Political Action Committees - Solicitation DisclosuresDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0303
    (SB0854)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesDelegate TurnerIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0426 / CH0589
    (SB0311 / CH0588)
Promoting Efficiencies in State ProcurementSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0451 / CH0186
    (SB0375 / CH0185)
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education RequirementsDelegate ClusterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Economic Matters
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0653 / CH0647Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsDelegate Wilson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1317 / CH0812Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017 PG 310-17Prince George's County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 812Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1443
    (SB0999)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform ActDelegate GlennIn the House - House Concur - Senate AmendmentsHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1452
    (SB1043)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Requirements - Standard Offer ServiceDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1489Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0109
    (HB0283 / CH0341)
Procurement - Prohibitions on ParticipationSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0271Criminal Law - Prostitution and Assignation - PenaltiesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0311 / CH0588
    (HB0426 / CH0589)
Promoting Efficiencies in State ProcurementPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 588Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0375 / CH0185
    (HB0451 / CH0186)
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education RequirementsSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 185Finance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0387 / CH0648Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of LimitationsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 648Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0854
    (HB0303)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0999
    (HB1443)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.