Solicitation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0137 / CH0803Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWIDelegate McConkeyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803Economic Matters
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0383Campaign Finance Entities - Solicitation Disclosures - ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0681Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0778Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder - PenaltyDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1134
    (SB0800)
Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices – Sexual Activity With an AnimalDelegate AtterbearyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1783 / CH0014
    (SB1243)
21st Century School Facilities ActDelegate JonesGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1805Election Law - Fund-Raising and Donations in Connection With a Campaign - Prohibition on FirearmsDelegate LaffertyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB0800
    (HB1134)
Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and SodomySenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1243
    (HB1783 / CH0014)
21st Century School Facilities ActSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 12:57 P.M.