Somerset County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0459Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Tasting LicenseDelegate OttoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0465
    (SB0424 / CH0263)
Somerset County - Emergency Burning Ban - Adoption and EnforcementDelegate OttoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0466
    (SB0155 / CH0195)
Somerset County - Sale of Small Boat Harbor DockDelegate OttoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0470Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax CollectionDelegate OttoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0491 / CH0120Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth CentersDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0492 / CH0473Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental UnitDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 473Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0154 / CH0194Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax CollectionSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0155 / CH0195
    (HB0466)
Somerset County - Sale of Small Boat Harbor DockSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0351 / CH0238Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Tasting LicenseSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 238Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0424 / CH0263
    (HB0465)
Somerset County - Emergency Burning Ban - Adoption and EnforcementSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 263Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0470 / CH0472Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental UnitSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 472Budget and Taxation
2/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0471 / CH0277Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth CentersSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 277Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.