Special Education

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0079
    (SB0135)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition SchoolDelegate Nathan-PulliamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0661
    (SB0995)
Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English ProficiencyDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1161 / CH0671Commission on Special Education Access and EquityDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1286
    (SB0691)
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children with Disabilities - Burden of ProofDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1467
    (SB0033)
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Wye River Upper SchoolDelegate EckardtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0033
    (HB1467)
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Wye River Upper SchoolSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0127
    (HB0102 / CH0425)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0135
    (HB0079)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition SchoolSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0691
    (HB1286)
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children with Disabilities - Burden of ProofSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0995
    (HB0661)
Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English ProficiencySenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.