Special Education

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0162
    (SB0172 / CH0464)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0413 / CH0400Special Education - Individualized Education Program Parental Notice Requirements and Service Models ListDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 400Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0518
    (SB0489)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition SchoolDelegate JonesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2014 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0798 / CH0330
    (SB0701 / CH0329)
Education - Children With Disabilities - Habilitative Services InformationDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1198
    (SB0779)
Education - Children With Disabilities - Due Process HearingsDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1300Special Education - Visually Impaired Students - Orientation and Mobility EvaluationDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0120 / CH0136Education - Children With Disabilities - Parent SurrogatesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0172 / CH0464
    (HB0162)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations Operating Budget (B1)
SB0489
    (HB0518)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition SchoolSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2014 - 9:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0701 / CH0329
    (HB0798 / CH0330)
Education - Children With Disabilities - Habilitative Services InformationSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0779
    (HB1198)
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of ProofSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.