Special Education

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0044
    (SB0314)
Special Education - IEP Translation Pilot Program - EstablishmentDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0047Special Education - Loan Assistance Repayment and Paraprofessional TrainingDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0159Special Education - Standards and Workload Guidelines for Teachers and Related Services ProvidersDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0277
    (SB0785)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Elizabeth School Indoor PlaygroundDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0278 / CH0411
    (SB0015)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education ProgramDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 411Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0342Special Education - Related Services Providers - ConsortiumDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0344
    (SB0390)
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of ProofDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0535 / CH0430
    (SB0538)
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility InstructionDelegate TurnerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0668Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Attorney's FeesDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1060Special Education - Individualized Education Program Facilitated MeetingsDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1069
    (SB0677 / CH0377)
Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master PlanDelegate RosenbergVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0015
    (HB0278 / CH0411)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education ProgramSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2015 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0314
    (HB0044)
Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native LanguageSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0390
    (HB0344)
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of ProofSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0538
    (HB0535 / CH0430)
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility InstructionSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0677 / CH0377
    (HB1069)
Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master PlanSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 377Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0785
    (HB0277)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Elizabeth School Indoor PlaygroundSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.