Special Education

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0085 / CH0250Education - Children With Disabilities - Support Services - Parental NotificationDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Ways and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0086 / CH0205
    (SB0421 / CH0204)
Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native LanguageDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Ways and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0163 / CH0164
    (SB0129 / CH0163)
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Submission of a Comprehensive Master Plan - Repeal of Duplicative RequirementDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 164Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0397
    (SB0786)
Education - Assessments - Best Practices in the Administration of AssessmentsDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0412 / CH0264
    (SB0533)
Education - Assessments - Administration and Provision of InformationDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 264Ways and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0537
    (SB0373 / CH0196)
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - ClarificationDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0778Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program ProcessDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0895 / CH0235
    (SB0823 / CH0234)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program - Membership, Duties, and ExtensionDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 235Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0999 / CH0702
    (SB0905 / CH0701)
Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationDelegate KaiserEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702Ways and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1058Task Force to Review the Workload of Special Educators in the StateDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1191Task Force to Study an Online Program for Paraprofessionals Assisting Students With AutismDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1213Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - EstablishmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0129 / CH0163
    (HB0163 / CH0164)
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Submission of a Comprehensive Master Plan - Repeal of Duplicative RequirementSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 163Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0373 / CH0196
    (HB0537)
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - ClarificationSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Budget and Taxation
2/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0421 / CH0204
    (HB0086 / CH0205)
Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native LanguageSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0533
    (HB0412 / CH0264)
Education - Assessments - Administration and Provision of InformationSenator PinskyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0786
    (HB0397)
Education - Assessments - Best Practices in the Administration of AssessmentsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0823 / CH0234
    (HB0895 / CH0235)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program - Membership, Duties, and ExtensionSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 234Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0905 / CH0701
    (HB0999 / CH0702)
Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationSenator KingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701Budget and Taxation
3/1/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0950Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program ProcessSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (45-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.