Special Education

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0096
    (SB0126)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - TLC's Katherine Thomas SchoolDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0331
    (SB0786 / CH0611)
Education - Behavior Intervention Plans - Physical Restraint and SeclusionDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1240 / CH0715Individualized Education Programs - StudiesDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 715Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1310Education - Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate ProgramDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0126
    (HB0096)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - TLC's Katherine Thomas SchoolSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0244Task Force to Study Suspension Rates of African American Prekindergarten StudentsSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0786 / CH0611
    (HB0331)
Education - Restraint and Seclusion - Consideration and ReportingSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 611Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0825Education - Nonpublic Schools - Programs for Students With Special NeedsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.