Special Education

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0271
    (SB0117)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - TLC's Katherine Thomas SchoolDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 5:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0493
    (SB0638)
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading InstructionDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0496
    (SB0339)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Ivymount SchoolDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 5:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0910
    (SB0548)
Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and InterventionsDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Third Reading Passed (136-0)Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0966
    (SB1103)
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate ProgramDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1254 / CH0775Education – School Discipline – Data CollectionDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1489Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of ProofDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1533Students With a Disability - Brain Injury Screening - Evaluation for Individualized Education ProgramDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1791
    (SB1214)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Elizabeth SchoolDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0117
    (HB0271)
Creation of a State Debt – Montgomery County – TLC’s Katherine Thomas SchoolSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0339
    (HB0496)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Ivymount SchoolSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0548
    (HB0910)
Education – Students With Reading Difficulties – Screenings and InterventionsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0638
    (HB0493)
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading InstructionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1103
    (HB0966)
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate ProgramSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1213Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspensions and ExpulsionsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1214
    (HB1791)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Elizabeth SchoolSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:42 A.M.