Stadium Authority

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0525
    (SB0516 / CH0283)
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating DeficitsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0516 / CH0283
    (HB0525)
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating DeficitsSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 283Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0743
    (HB0860 / CH0647)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Senator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and TaxationRules and Executive NominationsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.