Stadium Authority

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0133Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - RenovationChair, Appropriations CommitteeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0311
    (SB0400 / CH0851)
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve FundBaltimore City DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1472Maryland Stadium Authority - Use of State Owned or Leased Suite - DisclosureDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1548 / CH0639
    (SB1084 / CH0640)
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership FundDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1783 / CH0014
    (SB1243)
21st Century School Facilities ActDelegate JonesGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0040 / CH0150Maryland Stadium Authority - Exemption From Department of Information Technology OversightChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 150Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0400 / CH0851
    (HB0311)
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve FundSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0415Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Workgroup to Study Data Collection to Assist Small BusinessesSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1084 / CH0640
    (HB1548 / CH0639)
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership FundSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 640Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1243
    (HB1783 / CH0014)
21st Century School Facilities ActSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.