Stadiums

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0275 / CH0461
    (SB0349 / CH0460)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Wicomico County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1085
    (SB0641)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1262Public Health - Synthetic Infill Turf Fields - Informational SignsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0307Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2013Senator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0349 / CH0460
    (HB0275 / CH0461)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Senator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0641
    (HB1085)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.