Stadiums

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0777Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0862
    (SB0367)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction ActDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1076 / CH0646Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sports Stadium License MC 19-16Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 646Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1266
    (SB0881)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and ResalesDelegate FrickIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1269
    (SB0223)
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and RemediesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1474
    (SB1038)
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference CenterDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0223
    (HB1269)
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and RemediesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0367
    (HB0862)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction ActSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment (M3)
SB0724 / CH0041Alcoholic Beverages ArticlePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0881
    (HB1266)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and ResalesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1038
    (HB1474)
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference CenterSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.