State Aid

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Repeal of Constitutional Amendment - Changes to Statutory ProvisionsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0114Task Force to Study Recovery Efforts Following Residential FiresDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0229 / CH0004
    (SB0277)
State Aid for Public Education - Certification of Net Taxable IncomeSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 4Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0569Environment - Wastewater Treatment Facilities - Financial Assistance StudyDelegate ElliottIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0613 / CH0624Sustainable Communities - Designation and FinancingChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 624Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0778 / CH0332
    (SB0899 / CH0331)
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 332Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0952
    (SB0782)
Correctional Services - Inmate Telephone Services - Legal CounselDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0977
    (SB0039 / CH0170)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Special Vintage Reproduction Registration PlateDelegate McDermottVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1026Education - Public School Funding - CalculationDelegate ClagettIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1033Education - Taxpayers' Savings ActDelegate StocksdaleIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1061Task Force on Public School EfficiencyDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1231State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure ActDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1266
    (SB0799)
Energy - Landfill Diversion - Municipal Solid Waste Portfolio StandardDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1315 / CH0150Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking (Maryland Jobs Development Act)Delegate ClagettApproved by the Governor - Chapter 150Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1474
    (SB0958)
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital FundsDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0039 / CH0170
    (HB0977)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Special Vintage Reproduction Registration PlateSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 170Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0127
    (HB0102 / CH0425)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0277
    (HB0229 / CH0004)
State Aid for Public Education - Certification of Net Taxable IncomePresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0303State Payments of Public School Construction Costs - Remittance of Reimbursement to CountySenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0799
    (HB1266)
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task ForceSenator MiddletonIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0812Tuition Cap and College Opportunity Act of 2013Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Higher Education (F2)
SB0899 / CH0331
    (HB0778 / CH0332)
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0926 / CH0581Education - State and Local Aid Program for Certification or Renewal of Certification - Sunset RepealSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 581Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0958
    (HB1474)
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital FundsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1055State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort RequirementsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.